|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 1922 | 24/08/1922 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 14/10/1925 | 21/01/1926 | 100 days | General | After derailment |
||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1926 | 15/02/1926 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/08/1928 | 18/10/1928 | 56 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1929 | 09/01/1930 | 29 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1931 | 11/02/1931 | 38 days | General | Boiler number D558 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1934 | 02/05/1934 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2155 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 53 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1939 | 09/06/1939 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2383 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1942 | 30/01/1942 | 26 days | General | Boiler number D1963 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1945 | 14/07/1945 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2876 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1946 | 12/08/1946 | 34 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3370 |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/08/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1948 | 20/02/1948 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3320 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3370 |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/11/1949 | 06/01/1950 | 46 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 63370 |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/01/1950 | 23/01/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1950 | 16/12/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24165 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1953 | 07/03/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24289 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1953 | 01/04/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1957 | 21/06/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24307 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1957 | 08/07/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1958 | 10/04/1958 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1959 | 15/10/1959 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1960 | 29/04/1960 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1960 | 17/12/1960 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24256 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2213 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: 24/08/1922. | ||
14/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1925. Dep: 21/01/1926. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
04/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/02/1926. Dep: 15/02/1926. | ||
26/04/1926 | Allocation | Loaned to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
02/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
24/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1928. Dep: 18/10/1928. | ||
12/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/12/1929. Dep: 09/01/1930. | ||
05/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1931. Dep: 11/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D558 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1934. Dep: 02/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2155 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. | ||
01/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1939. Dep: 09/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2383 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1942. Dep: 30/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1963 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
21/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
26/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. | ||
19/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2876 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/07/1946. Dep: 12/08/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3370 |
||
21/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. | ||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
15/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1948. Dep: 20/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3320 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3370 |
||
07/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
22/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1949. Dep: 06/01/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63370 |
||
17/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1950. Dep: 23/01/1950. | ||
09/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24165 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24289 (Diagram 50A) |
||
27/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1953. Dep: 01/04/1953. | ||
04/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/04/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. | ||
23/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1957. Dep: 21/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24307 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/07/1957. Dep: 08/07/1957. | ||
14/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1958. Dep: 10/04/1958. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
05/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1959. Dep: 15/10/1959. | ||
25/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1960. Dep: 29/04/1960. | ||
19/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24256 (Diagram 50A) |
||
11/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
01/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63370 from Neville Hill (55H) |