|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 07/03/1923 | 23/05/1923 | 78 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/02/1927 | 23/05/1927 | 105 days | General | Boiler number D1944 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/05/1929 | 16/07/1929 | 48 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/04/1930 | 27/05/1930 | 44 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/06/1932 | 18/07/1932 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1934 | 08/02/1935 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2637 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1939 | 24/11/1939 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1939 | 01/12/1939 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1942 | 13/06/1942 | 41 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/05/1944 | 09/06/1944 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 05/05/1947 | 30/05/1947 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1948 | 26/08/1948 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63361 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1948 | 17/09/1948 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1951 | 26/05/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24188 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1951 | 30/05/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/08/1951 | 03/09/1951 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1952 | 26/06/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/02/1953 | 11/02/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 24162 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 03/12/1956 | 04/01/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1961 | 03/06/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24307 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1961 | 15/06/1961 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1963 | 12/09/1963 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1291 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
07/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1923. Dep: 23/05/1923. | ||
22/05/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
08/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1927. Dep: 23/05/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1944 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
30/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1929. Dep: 16/07/1929. | ||
14/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1930. Dep: 27/05/1930. | ||
06/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/06/1932. Dep: 18/07/1932. | ||
27/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1934. Dep: 08/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2637 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annfield Plain (AFP) | ||
09/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1939. Dep: 24/11/1939. | ||
24/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1939. Dep: 01/12/1939. | ||
09/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
04/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942. | ||
13/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1944. Dep: 09/06/1944. | ||
18/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3361 | ||
05/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1947. Dep: 30/05/1947. | ||
08/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1948. Dep: 26/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63361 |
||
01/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1948. Dep: 17/09/1948. | ||
30/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24188 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1951. Dep: 30/05/1951. | ||
08/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1951. Dep: 03/09/1951. | ||
26/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 26/06/1952. Dep: 26/06/1952. | ||
04/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1953. Dep: 11/02/1953. | ||
13/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24162 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1956. Dep: 04/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
12/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
08/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1961. Dep: 03/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24307 (Diagram 50A) |
||
06/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1961. Dep: 15/06/1961. | ||
01/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
14/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/08/1963. Dep: 12/09/1963. | ||
02/02/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
17/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
07/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63361 from West Hartlepool (51C) |