|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 14/05/1924 | 19/08/1924 | 98 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/12/1927 | 21/01/1928 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/08/1928 | 20/09/1928 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/08/1929 | 10/12/1929 | 114 days | General | Boiler number E4/41 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 18/06/1931 | 23/06/1931 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1933 | 27/02/1933 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 4 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1935 | 04/11/1935 | 57 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1938 | 19/08/1938 | 86 days | General | Boiler number 2393 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1940 | 08/03/1940 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1941 | 12/06/1941 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2440 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1943 | 03/09/1943 | 74 days | General | Boiler number D1568 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1948 | 05/11/1948 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63358 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1951 | 27/10/1951 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24207 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/11/1951 | 14/11/1951 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1953 | 06/06/1953 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1953 | 10/06/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1954 | 02/12/1954 | 28 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1956 | 23/04/1956 | 28 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1957 | 30/08/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24289 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1961 | 23/06/1961 | 103 days | General | Boiler number 24330 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1284 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
08/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annfield Plain (AFP) | ||
14/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1924. Dep: 19/08/1924. | ||
28/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1927. Dep: 21/01/1928. | ||
10/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1928. Dep: 20/09/1928. | ||
19/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1929. Dep: 10/12/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/41 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
18/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to East Hartlepool (EHL) | ||
18/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1931. Dep: 23/06/1931. | ||
24/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1933. Dep: 27/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/09/1935. Dep: 04/11/1935. | ||
26/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1938. Dep: 19/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2393 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
21/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1940. Dep: 08/03/1940. | ||
10/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
09/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1941. Dep: 12/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2440 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
22/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1943. Dep: 03/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1568 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
20/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
12/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3358 | ||
13/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1948. Dep: 05/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63358 |
||
04/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
11/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
17/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
04/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1951. Dep: 27/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24207 (Diagram 50A) |
||
08/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1951. Dep: 14/11/1951. | ||
04/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/05/1953. Dep: 06/06/1953. | ||
08/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1953. Dep: 10/06/1953. | ||
05/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/11/1954. Dep: 02/12/1954. | ||
27/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/03/1956. Dep: 23/04/1956. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
02/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1957. Dep: 30/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24289 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
13/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1961. Dep: 23/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24330 (Diagram 50A) |
||
09/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63358 from Tyne Dock (52H) |