|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 13/06/1924 | 02/09/1924 | 82 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/10/1924 | 08/10/1924 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/08/1927 | 22/11/1927 | 104 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/07/1928 | 21/08/1928 | 41 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/04/1931 | 07/05/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2393 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1934 | 18/07/1934 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1934 | 06/12/1934 | 25 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1938 | 07/09/1938 | 73 days | General | Boiler number AW7 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1940 | 08/01/1941 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2258 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/01/1946 | 22/01/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1947 | 03/04/1947 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1947 | 17/04/1947 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/07/1948 | 31/08/1948 | 56 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63346 |
||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1950 | 05/08/1950 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2874 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1950 | 16/08/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1953 | 07/03/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24252 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1953 | 13/03/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1956 | 03/02/1956 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1958 | 22/10/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24239 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1962 | 10/03/1962 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/02/1955 | Snowplough fitted Q6\'s | On 23rd February, 0-8-0 Q6 63346 and another unidentified Q6 were observed coupled together with large pusher type snow ploughs attached at each end of the locomotives. The locomotives were on snow plough duty on the Consett-Shotley Bridge-Newcastle line, proceeding in the direction of Newcastle near Ebchester. Later on the same afternoon, the two engines were seen near Annfield Plain on the Consett-Tyne Dock line. On 19th February, 0-6-0T J71 68290 was observed near East Boldon travelling light in the direction of Newcastle. | SLS/195504 |
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (Sunderland) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1253 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
13/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1924. Dep: 02/09/1924. | ||
06/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1924. Dep: 08/10/1924. | ||
02/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
11/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1927. Dep: 22/11/1927. | ||
12/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/07/1928. Dep: 21/08/1928. | ||
02/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1931. Dep: 07/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2393 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1934. Dep: 18/07/1934. | ||
12/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1934. Dep: 06/12/1934. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
27/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1938. Dep: 07/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW7 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1940. Dep: 08/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
19/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
21/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2258 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
08/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1946. Dep: 22/01/1946. | ||
14/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3346 | ||
01/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1947. Dep: 03/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1947. Dep: 17/04/1947. | ||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
07/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1948. Dep: 31/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63346 |
||
21/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1950. Dep: 05/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2874 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1950. Dep: 16/08/1950. | ||
06/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24252 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1953. Dep: 13/03/1953. | ||
09/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1956. Dep: 03/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
23/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1958. Dep: 22/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24239 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (52K) | ||
12/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1962. Dep: 10/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
29/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63346 from Sunderland (52G) |