|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 19/02/1923 | 19/04/1923 | 60 days | General | Boiler number D1441 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/03/1924 | 07/04/1924 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/04/1927 | 01/07/1927 | 71 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/08/1930 | 10/10/1930 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1934 | 15/09/1934 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1955 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1938 | 23/12/1938 | 64 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1941 | 29/05/1941 | 39 days | General | Boiler number D1769 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1943 | 08/01/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number D2167 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/03/1948 | 13/04/1948 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63338 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 793 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Blyth (North) (NBH) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
19/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1923. Dep: 19/04/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1441 (Diagram 56) |
||
22/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 07/04/1924. | ||
22/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1927. Dep: 01/07/1927. | ||
28/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1930. Dep: 10/10/1930. | ||
16/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1934. Dep: 15/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1955 (Diagram 56) |
||
23/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
21/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1938. Dep: 23/12/1938. | ||
21/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1941. Dep: 29/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1769 (Diagram 56) |
||
15/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2167 (Diagram 56) |
||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3338 | ||
08/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 56B) |
||
11/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. | ||
22/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1948. Dep: 13/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63338 |
||
01/10/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63338 from Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |