|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1922 | 09/1922 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 22/12/1924 | 28/02/1925 | 69 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1925 | 29/07/1925 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1928 | 19/05/1928 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 2085 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1930 | 16/02/1931 | 56 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1934 | 22/10/1934 | 25 days | General | Boiler number D1365 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1937 | 10/05/1937 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 2886 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1937 | 19/05/1937 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1938 | 05/01/1939 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1939 | 14/09/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1940 | 08/07/1940 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1940 | 28/08/1940 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1942 | 07/04/1942 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1943 | 02/07/1943 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number D1427 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1946 | 09/03/1946 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/05/1946 | 22/05/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1947 | 25/06/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 789 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
22/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1924. Dep: 28/02/1925. | ||
24/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1925. Dep: 29/07/1925. | ||
12/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1928. Dep: 19/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2085 (Diagram 56) |
||
23/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1930. Dep: 16/02/1931. | ||
28/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1934. Dep: 22/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1365 (Diagram 56) |
||
03/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1937. Dep: 10/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2886 (Diagram 56B) |
||
11/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1937. Dep: 19/05/1937. | ||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
08/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1938. Dep: 05/01/1939. | ||
10/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1939. Dep: 14/09/1939. | ||
19/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
14/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/06/1940. Dep: 08/07/1940. | ||
25/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/08/1940. Dep: 28/08/1940. | ||
06/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1942. Dep: 07/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 56B) |
||
22/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/06/1943. Dep: 02/07/1943. | ||
14/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1427 (Diagram 56) |
||
12/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946. | ||
07/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/05/1946. Dep: 22/05/1946. | ||
25/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3337 | ||
25/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/06/1947. Dep: 25/06/1947. | ||
02/08/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3337 from Darlington (DAR) |