|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1915 | 06/1915 | General | Boiler number G142 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1916 | 12/1916 | General | Boiler number D607 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1922 | 20/10/1922 | General | |||||
Gateshead Works | 28/02/1923 | 16/03/1923 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/05/1925 | 25/08/1925 | 114 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/07/1928 | 11/09/1928 | 71 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/11/1931 | 23/12/1931 | 35 days | General | Boiler number D856 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1934 | 06/12/1934 | 25 days | General | Boiler number D2068 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1938 | 29/10/1938 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2806 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1941 | 22/04/1941 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2811 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1943 | 09/10/1943 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3380 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/08/1945 | 14/09/1945 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1946 | 23/08/1946 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3609 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3328 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1947 | 17/05/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1948 | 19/08/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 767 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
12/01/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
28/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/02/1923. Dep: 16/03/1923. | ||
04/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1925. Dep: 25/08/1925. | ||
03/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1928. Dep: 11/09/1928. | ||
14/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
19/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1931. Dep: 23/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D856 (Diagram 56) |
||
12/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1934. Dep: 06/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2068 (Diagram 56) |
||
27/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2806 (Diagram 56B) |
||
24/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1941. Dep: 22/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2811 (Diagram 56B) |
||
08/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3380 (Diagram 56B) |
||
04/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
29/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/08/1945. Dep: 14/09/1945. | ||
11/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1946. Dep: 23/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3609 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3328 |
||
10/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/05/1947. Dep: 17/05/1947. | ||
19/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 19/08/1948. Dep: 19/08/1948. | ||
10/09/1948 | Modification | Diagram 56B number 3121 boiler fitted | ||
11/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63328 | ||
13/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
19/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
13/01/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63328 from Middlesbrough (51D) |