|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1916 | 02/1916 | General | |||||
1922 | 06/1922 | General | Boiler number D1400 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1924 | 30/05/1924 | 71 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1924 | 11/09/1924 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1927 | 03/06/1927 | 108 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/01/1930 | 14/02/1930 | 45 days | General | Boiler number D1007 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1934 | 21/08/1934 | 65 days | Heavy | Boiler number D1066 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1935 | 14/03/1935 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1938 | 07/11/1938 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2800 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1939 | 26/09/1939 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1941 | 21/10/1941 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2085 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1943 | 14/04/1943 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number D1769 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 15/03/1945 | 30/03/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1946 | 04/10/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1946 | 26/11/1946 | 36 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1948 | 12/11/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 764 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/02/1916 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1916 boiler fitted | ||
21/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1924. Dep: 30/05/1924. | ||
31/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
26/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1924. Dep: 11/09/1924. | ||
16/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1927. Dep: 03/06/1927. | ||
01/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1930. Dep: 14/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1007 (Diagram 56) |
||
18/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/06/1934. Dep: 21/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1066 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1935. Dep: 14/03/1935. | ||
15/04/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
10/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1938. Dep: 07/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2800 (Diagram 56B) |
||
16/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 26/09/1939. | ||
08/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 21/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2085 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
01/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/04/1943. Dep: 14/04/1943. | ||
13/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. | ||
26/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1769 (Diagram 56) |
||
15/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1945. Dep: 30/03/1945. | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3327 | ||
06/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1946. Dep: 04/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 56B) |
||
22/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/10/1946. Dep: 26/11/1946. | ||
07/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
12/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/11/1948. Dep: 12/11/1948. | ||
22/11/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3327 from Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
12/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63327 but not taken up |