|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 30/04/1923 | 23/07/1923 | 85 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1926 | 08/04/1926 | 85 days | General | Boiler number D1061 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1930 | 24/02/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1933 | 31/08/1933 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1809 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1933 | 20/09/1933 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1937 | 27/04/1937 | 47 days | General | Boiler number D1704 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1940 | 19/04/1940 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1940 | 14/05/1940 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1942 | 21/04/1942 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1942 | 23/11/1942 | 27 days | General | Boiler number D1817 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1944 | 19/01/1945 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1946 | 08/03/1947 | 71 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/10/1948 | 01/11/1948 | 25 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63322 |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1949 | 24/01/1949 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works (To scrap yard) | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 657 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
30/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1923. Dep: 23/07/1923. | ||
14/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1926. Dep: 08/04/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1061 (Diagram 56) |
||
13/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1930. Dep: 24/02/1930. | ||
03/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1933. Dep: 31/08/1933. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q5/2 Boiler number D1809 (Diagram 56A) |
||
14/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1933. Dep: 20/09/1933. | ||
07/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
12/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1937. Dep: 27/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1704 (Diagram 56A) |
||
19/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1940. Dep: 19/04/1940. | ||
23/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1940. Dep: 14/05/1940. | ||
03/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1942. Dep: 21/04/1942. | ||
28/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1942. Dep: 23/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1817 (Diagram 56A) |
||
08/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
06/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1944. Dep: 19/01/1945. | ||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3322 | ||
28/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1946. Dep: 08/03/1947. | ||
11/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. | ||
08/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1948. Dep: 01/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63322 |
||
24/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 24/01/1949. Dep: 24/01/1949. | ||
02/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
12/02/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63322 from Middlesbrough (MID) |