|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1920 | 03/07/1920 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1923 | 25/08/1923 | 123 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1926 | 10/04/1926 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 7519 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3457 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1928 | 10/08/1928 | 85 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1929 | 01/06/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1931 | 29/08/1931 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1934 | 03/02/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7512 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1936 | 29/02/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1938 | 14/05/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 7502 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1940 | 09/03/1940 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1942 | 25/07/1942 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9362 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9247 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1948 | 27/03/1948 | 33 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63476 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1950 | 26/08/1950 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 21000 (Diagram 2) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 457 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1412 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
24/06/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920. | ||
25/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1923. Dep: 25/08/1923. | ||
01/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1926. Dep: 10/04/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7519 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3457 |
||
18/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1928. Dep: 10/08/1928. | ||
27/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 01/06/1929. | ||
11/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931. | ||
06/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1934. Dep: 03/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7512 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1936. Dep: 29/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2) |
||
31/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
18/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7502 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940. | ||
13/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1942. Dep: 25/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9362 (Diagram 2) |
||
13/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. | ||
06/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9247 (Diagram 2) |
||
04/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3476 | ||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1948. Dep: 27/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63476 |
||
03/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21000 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
03/1952 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
17/03/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63476 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |