|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1945 | 21/07/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1946 | 20/04/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3987 |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1947 | 28/08/1947 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1949 | 16/06/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 9386 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63987 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1951 | 26/09/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21034 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1954 | 15/02/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1956 | 24/04/1956 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1958 | 30/12/1958 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1959 | 16/07/1959 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1959 | 09/10/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1961 | 14/12/1961 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/01/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3857 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1955 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
29/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
09/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945. | ||
18/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 20/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3987 |
||
31/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
27/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1947. Dep: 28/08/1947. | ||
20/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
07/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
13/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
18/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1949. Dep: 16/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9386 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63987 |
||
07/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
27/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
26/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1951. Dep: 26/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21034 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
20/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1954. Dep: 15/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1956. Dep: 24/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1958. Dep: 30/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1959. Dep: 16/07/1959. | ||
05/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1959. Dep: 09/10/1959. | ||
30/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1961. Dep: 14/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2) |
||
30/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63987 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
03/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |