|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1943 | 10/04/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1944 | 20/01/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1946 | 22/11/1946 | 28 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1948 | 24/06/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 9390 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63982 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1950 | 15/05/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1951 | 10/05/1951 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1952 | 16/09/1952 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1953 | 12/02/1953 | 41 days | CH | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1954 | 10/11/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1956 | 04/08/1956 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1957 | 09/08/1957 | 40 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28352 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1960 | 27/02/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28570 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1961 | 03/02/1961 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/12/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3852 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1950 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
27/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943. | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
04/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. | ||
30/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945. | ||
17/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3982 | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 22/11/1946. | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
25/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1948. Dep: 24/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9390 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63982 |
||
16/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1950. Dep: 15/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
30/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/04/1951. Dep: 10/05/1951. | ||
05/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
11/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
08/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1952. Dep: 16/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/01/1953 | Works Visit | |||
15/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1954. Dep: 10/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1956. Dep: 04/08/1956. | ||
01/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1957. Dep: 09/08/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28352 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1960. Dep: 27/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28570 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
01/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1961. Dep: 03/02/1961. | ||
09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63982 from Grantham (34F) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Larkinson F C : Grantham |