|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1934 | 07/04/1934 | 87 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1935 | 04/05/1935 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1936 | 11/11/1936 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 8456 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1937 | 03/11/1937 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1938 | 24/12/1938 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1939 | 02/09/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8858 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1941 | 12/07/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1943 | 03/04/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1945 | 17/03/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9466 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1946 | 13/07/1946 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1947 | 16/03/1947 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1947 | 08/07/1947 | 71 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1948 | 28/05/1948 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9469 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63954 |
||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1949 | 11/01/1950 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1950 | 14/12/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21010 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1952 | 31/10/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1954 | 17/12/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21053 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1957 | 27/07/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 21022 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1950 | Unreported renumberings | The following locos have been reported as renumberd by observations, but whose changes have not been notified by the Eastern and North Eastern regions: 69353, 69674, 69719, 63719, 63951/4/5/6, an 69012/3; the latter pair of 'J.72's' were delivered in the 60000 series! | SLS/195007 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/08/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2961 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1780 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
11/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934. | ||
16/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1935. Dep: 04/05/1935. | ||
28/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1936. Dep: 11/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8456 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1937. Dep: 03/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1938. Dep: 24/12/1938. | ||
22/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 02/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8858 (Diagram 2) |
||
07/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941. | ||
13/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1943. Dep: 03/04/1943. | ||
03/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9466 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 13/07/1946. | ||
24/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3954 | ||
16/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1947. Dep: 16/03/1947. | ||
29/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/04/1947. Dep: 08/07/1947. | ||
26/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1948. Dep: 28/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9469 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63954 |
||
03/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/12/1949. Dep: 11/01/1950. | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
14/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1950. Dep: 14/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21010 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1952. Dep: 31/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1954. Dep: 17/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21053 (Diagram 2) |
||
21/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1957. Dep: 27/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21022 (Diagram 2) |
||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
14/03/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63954 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
04/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |