|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1934 | 03/09/1934 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1936 | 31/08/1936 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9013 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1939 | 29/07/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1943 | 27/03/1943 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9366 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1944 | 27/01/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1947 | 01/04/1947 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1947 | 26/09/1947 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1949 | 11/02/1949 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 9163 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63952 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1949 | 09/04/1949 | 34 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1951 | 29/05/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21024 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1951 | 13/08/1951 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1952 | 16/12/1952 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1953 | 04/11/1953 | 33 days | General | DOI] 18/11-19/12/55 G Boiler number 21070 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1958 | 07/05/1958 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 21065 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1958 | 02/09/1958 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1959 | 20/08/1959 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1959 | 06/10/1959 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1961 | 27/04/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/07/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2959 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1778 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
03/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1934. Dep: 03/09/1934. | ||
21/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1936. Dep: 31/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2) |
||
31/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9013 (Diagram 2) |
||
24/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939. | ||
19/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. | ||
20/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9366 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1944. Dep: 27/01/1945. | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3952 | ||
24/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1947. Dep: 01/04/1947. | ||
05/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1947. Dep: 26/09/1947. | ||
17/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1949. Dep: 11/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9163 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63952 |
||
07/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949. | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1951. Dep: 29/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21024 (Diagram 2) |
||
21/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1951. Dep: 13/08/1951. | ||
03/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 16/12/1952. | ||
03/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1953. Dep: 04/11/1953. Work undertaken: DOI] 18/11-19/12/55 G Boiler number 21070 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1958. Dep: 07/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21065 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1958. Dep: 02/09/1958. | ||
07/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/08/1959. Dep: 20/08/1959. | ||
19/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1959. Dep: 06/10/1959. | ||
27/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63952 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
27/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/04/1961. Dep: 27/04/1961. | ||
05/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |