|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 21/05/1933 | 06/07/1933 | 47 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1934 | 04/09/1934 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1936 | 15/08/1936 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 8974 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1937 | 06/09/1937 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 8972 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1939 | 29/04/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 4401 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1940 | 16/11/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1942 | 08/08/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1944 | 26/08/1944 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9440 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1946 | 22/06/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1947 | 27/06/1947 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1948 | 11/05/1948 | 37 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63947 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1950 | 09/06/1950 | 34 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9394 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1953 | 03/07/1953 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 21017 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1956 | 29/05/1956 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1957 | 18/01/1958 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1959 | 04/03/1959 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1960 | 14/04/1960 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1961 | 28/04/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/04/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2954 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1773 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
21/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/05/1933. Dep: 06/07/1933. | ||
24/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1934. Dep: 04/09/1934. | ||
08/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8974 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1937. Dep: 06/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8972 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4401 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1940. Dep: 16/11/1940. | ||
27/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942. | ||
29/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 26/08/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9440 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946. | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3947 | ||
30/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1947. Dep: 27/06/1947. | ||
05/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1948. Dep: 11/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63947 |
||
07/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1950. Dep: 09/06/1950. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9394 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
13/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1953. Dep: 03/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21017 (Diagram 2) |
||
30/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/04/1956. Dep: 29/05/1956. | ||
09/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1957. Dep: 18/01/1958. | ||
23/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
27/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1959. Dep: 04/03/1959. | ||
27/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1960. Dep: 14/04/1960. | ||
28/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63947 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
28/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/04/1961. Dep: 28/04/1961. | ||
05/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |