|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1926 | 17/07/1926 | 120 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1929 | 30/03/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1931 | 03/10/1931 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1933 | 25/11/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 4408 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1935 | 29/06/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1937 | 14/08/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1939 | 25/11/1939 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1940 | 13/04/1940 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1942 | 20/06/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8182 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8856 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3936 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1949 | 20/05/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 9242 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63936 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1951 | 15/01/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 21046 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1954 | 03/08/1954 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 21045 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1957 | 18/04/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 21004 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1959 | 02/10/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 21047 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1961 | 05/12/1961 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 21003 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/12/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 491 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1578 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
01/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3491 | ||
20/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1926. Dep: 17/07/1926. | ||
16/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 30/03/1929. | ||
08/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1931. Dep: 03/10/1931. | ||
04/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1933. Dep: 25/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4408 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935. | ||
17/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937. | ||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939. | ||
24/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940. | ||
16/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8182 (Diagram 2) |
||
11/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. | ||
01/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
21/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8856 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3936 |
||
21/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1949. Dep: 20/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9242 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63936 |
||
19/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1951. Dep: 15/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21046 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1954. Dep: 03/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21045 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1957. Dep: 18/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21004 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1959. Dep: 02/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21047 (Diagram 2) |
||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
04/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1961. Dep: 05/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21003 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63936 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
03/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |