Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3605 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17011 Week
» 70027 Month
» 189554 Year
» 3216407 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1710 |
m/e |
12/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9104 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69104 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
N10 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/03/1958 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1902 |
HLD |
|
Hull Dairycoates |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/03/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/03/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1946 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1946 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
03/1946 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
05/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1954 |
York MPD |
During this period the South shed was temporarily reopened while repairs were being effected to the turntable in No. 4 roundhouse at the North shed. New Standard Class 3 2-6-0's from Swindon 77002 and 77003 called at York on 17/3/54 and 19/3/54 respectively en route for Darlington. The following Ll 2-6-4T's called at York en route from the south to Darlington Works for repair: 67792 (34E)-19/3/54, 67718 (34E)-29/3/54, 67756-9/4/54. On this latter date 67753 (34B) passed through York resplendent ex-Darlington Works, and likewise 67764 (53B) and 67795 (34E) on 20/4/54. J71 68296 (53A) and 68242 (53A) passed through York ex-Darlington Works on 19/3/54 and 12/4/54 respectively en route for Hull. On 9/4/54 J71 68238 (20D) was at York with rods 'down' while proceeding from Normanton to Darlington Works, and similarly 69104 (53A) from Hull to Darlington on 20/4/54. Another unusual visitor was 60509 (64B) en route from the Scottish Region to Doncaster Works on 28/4/54. 90439 (35A) was under repair at York shed on 29/3/54. |
SLS/195406 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1902 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1710 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
02/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed |
|
|
03/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9104 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69104 |
|
|
17/03/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69104 |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|