Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3911 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17317 Week
» 70333 Month
» 189860 Year
» 3216713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2618 |
m/e |
04/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9720 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69720 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
311 |
Works Number |
1687 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 04/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/11/1960 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
3w/e |
28/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2618 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1687 |
|
|
06/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9720 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69720 |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
14/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69720 |
|
|