Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2930 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16336 Week
» 69352 Month
» 188879 Year
» 3215732 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
934 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5934 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9358 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69358 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
4194 |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/11/1956 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1935 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 934 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4194 |
|
|
03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5934 |
|
|
08/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9358 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69358 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
10/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69358 |
|
|