Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1525 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14931 Week
» 67947 Month
» 187474 Year
» 3214327 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
745 |
m/e |
08/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5745 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9283 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
69283 |
m/e |
08/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3616 |
To Service |
During 08/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 12/06/1958 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1934 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 745 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3616 |
|
|
08/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5745 |
|
|
04/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9283 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
08/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69283 |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
17/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69283 |
|
|