Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4166 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17572 Week
» 70588 Month
» 190115 Year
» 3216968 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
544 |
m/e |
03/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5544 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9277 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
69277 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3577 |
To Service |
During 03/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 20/11/1956 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1928 |
Converted to N5/2 |
10/1929 |
Reverted to Class N5/1 |
08/1930 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 544 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3577 |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5544 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
10/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Reverted to Class N5/1 |
|
|
08/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9277 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barnsley (BRN) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69277 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
20/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69277 |
|
|