Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18933 Week
» 71949 Month
» 191476 Year
» 3218329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
527 |
m/e |
10/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5527 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9261 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69261 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3561 |
To Service |
During 10/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 08/01/1958 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
w/e |
14/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Langwith Junction |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1929 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 527 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3561 |
|
|
04/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5527 |
|
|
02/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9261 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69261 |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69261 |
|
|