Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1519 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19322 Week
» 72338 Month
» 191865 Year
» 3218718 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2585 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9552 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69552 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
6212 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/05/1960 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1944 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2585 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6212 |
|
|
12/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9552 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69552 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (34F) |
|
|
09/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69552 |
|
|