Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 899 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18702 Week
» 71718 Month
» 191245 Year
» 3218098 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1590 |
m/e |
04/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4590 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9470 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69470 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
267 |
Works Number |
1335 |
To Service |
During 04/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/08/1956 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1912 |
HSY |
|
Hornsey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34A |
|
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
20/06/1953 |
34B |
|
Hornsey |
4w/e |
25/07/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/08/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/08/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1590 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1335 |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4590 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9470 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69470 |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
06/08/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69470 |
|
|