Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1798 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15204 Week
» 68220 Month
» 187747 Year
» 3214600 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1587 |
m/e |
03/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4587 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9467 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69467 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
267 |
Works Number |
1332 |
To Service |
During 03/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/07/1956 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1587 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1332 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4587 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9467 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69467 |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) |
|
|
02/07/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69467 |
|
|