Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1583 |
m/e |
12/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4583 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9463 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69463 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
267 |
Works Number |
1328 |
To Service |
During 12/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 28/10/1955 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1911 |
HSY |
|
Hornsey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
37A |
|
Ardsley |
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
37A |
|
Ardsley |
4w/e |
21/07/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/10/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
37A |
Ardsley |
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1583 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1328 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4583 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9463 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69463 |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
28/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69463 |
|
|