Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1895 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19698 Week
» 72714 Month
» 192241 Year
» 3219094 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1573 |
m/e |
12/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4573 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9453 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69453 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
264 |
Works Number |
1288 |
To Service |
During 12/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 29/04/1958 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1910 |
HSY |
|
Hornsey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
5w/e |
24/04/1954 |
37A |
|
Ardsley |
5w/e |
23/04/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/04/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
ALLOC |
37A |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/04/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1573 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1288 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4573 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9453 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69453 |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
29/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69453 |
|
|