Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4316 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17722 Week
» 70738 Month
» 190265 Year
» 3217118 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1557 |
m/e |
12/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4557 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9437 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69437 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
254 |
Works Number |
1182 |
To Service |
During 12/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/07/1954 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ARD |
Ardsley |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/07/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1954 |
Doncaster Works (scrap roads) |
On 24/8/54 a visit to the new erecting shop at Doncaster Works revealed the first two (80106-7) of the batch of ten BR standard 2-6-4Ts in early stages of construction and the frames set up for the third (80108). Among engines in the scrap roads, either being cut up or awaiting decision, were 67369 (C12), 67412 (C13), 65002 (J1), 65020 (J2), 65493/95 (J5), 68854/59 (J52), and 69437/82 (N1). A2/1 60507 (64B) was resplendent outside the paint 'shop after general repair. |
SLS/195410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1557 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1182 |
|
|
05/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4557 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9437 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69437 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
19/07/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69437 |
|
|