Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1196 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15239 Week
» 80193 Month
» 282857 Year
» 3309710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1556 |
m/e |
12/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4556 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9436 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69436 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
254 |
Works Number |
1181 |
To Service |
During 12/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/07/1955 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1556 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1181 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4556 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9436 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69436 |
|
|
21/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) |
|
|
11/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69436 |
|
|