Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 40 Online
» 4652 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23563 Week
» 88517 Month
» 291181 Year
» 3318034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways (1st) |
E9011 |
on |
25/03/1948 |
British Railways |
67712 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Thompson |
Class |
L1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2030 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Wed 25/03/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 04/10/1961 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
25/03/1948 |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
w/e |
14/02/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/04/1961 |
Cambridge MPD |
On Easter Monday only 26 steam engines were on Cambridge shed and these included 6 stored L1s-67712/3/20/2/3/34. |
SLS/196105 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number E9011 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2030 |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67712 |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
04/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67712 |
|
|