Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2214 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15620 Week
» 68636 Month
» 188163 Year
» 3215016 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3822 |
m/e |
12/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1982 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61982 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1691 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
w/e |
16/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1962 |
Colwick MPD |
K3s 61943/82 (transferred to Stationary boiler stock) are at Colwick on these duties. |
SLS/196212 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3822 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1691 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1982 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61982 |
|
|
16/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61982 |
|
|
1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|