Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 119 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17922 Week
» 70938 Month
» 190465 Year
» 3217318 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2767 |
m/e |
08/1930 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1896 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61896 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1501 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 08/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/05/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1930 |
NWE |
|
New England |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
MAR |
|
March |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
GOR |
|
Gorton |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/05/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
GOR |
Gorton |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2767 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1501 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1896 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61896 |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61896 |
|
|