Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 281 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21315 Week
» 119960 Month
» 322624 Year
» 3349477 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
188 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1856 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
61856 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1281 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/12/1962 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DON |
Doncaster |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
w/e |
14/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
38B |
Annesley |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
LOAN |
16D |
Annesley |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
16D |
Annesley |
on |
23/02/1958 |
LOAN |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
16/05/1959 |
ALLOC |
91NE |
|
4w/e |
30/05/1959 |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1932 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 188 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1281 |
|
|
01/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1856 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61856 |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61856 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|