Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1890 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15296 Week
» 68312 Month
» 187839 Year
» 3214692 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
73 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1822 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61822 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1247 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/11/1962 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1932 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1950 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. |
SLS/195005 |
30/04/1950 |
Doncaster Works |
Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. |
SLS/195006 |
31/12/1961 |
Millhouses closure |
Millhouses M.P.D. (41C) was closed as from 31/12/61 and its allocation of locomotives distributed as follows : 41209/45/6, 43037, 45570/6/90/4, 45602/7/27/54/6/64/83/725, 45536, 46131/47/8/51/4, 46450, 61083/93, 61820/2, 73016/65/155 all to Canklow (41D); 78022/3/4/5 to Doncaster (36A). |
SLS/196203 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 73 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1247 |
|
|
03/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1822 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61822 |
|
|
16/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C) |
|
|
06/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
09/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
04/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61822 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|