|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 52 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1243 |
||
11/1927 | Modification | Modification: Steam Reverse Fitted | ||
11/1934 | Modification | Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted | ||
11/1934 | Modification | Modification: Steam Reverse Removed | ||
05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1818 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) | ||
11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61818 | ||
10/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
24/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
05/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61818 |