Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 639 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14045 Week
» 67061 Month
» 186588 Year
» 3213441 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
38 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1815 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61815 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1240 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/07/1960 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
on |
23/03/1947 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
18/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
4w/e |
28/03/1958 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/07/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1928 |
Steam Reverse Fitted |
10/1934 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
10/1934 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 38 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1240 |
|
|
03/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Fitted |
|
|
10/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
10/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1815 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61815 |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
11/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61815 |
|
|