Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1703 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19506 Week
» 72522 Month
» 192049 Year
» 3218902 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
32 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1812 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61812 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1237 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1932 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 32 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1237 |
|
|
01/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1812 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61812 |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61812 |
|
|