|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1009 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1529 |
||
09/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4009 | ||
07/1933 | Modification | Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted | ||
12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1809 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) | ||
03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61809 | ||
18/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
05/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) | ||
07/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
08/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
03/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61809 |