Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2536 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15942 Week
» 68958 Month
» 188485 Year
» 3215338 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1006 |
m/e |
04/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4006 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1806 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61806 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
290 |
Works Number |
1520 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/03/1960 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1921 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40A |
|
Lincoln |
5w/e |
15/11/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/03/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1934 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1006 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1520 |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4006 |
|
|
02/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1806 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61806 |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61806 |
|
|