Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1514 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19317 Week
» 72333 Month
» 191860 Year
» 3218713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1000 |
m/e |
03/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4000 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1800 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
61800 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
290 |
Works Number |
1509 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/07/1962 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1920 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
13/07/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1932 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/06/1948 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1000 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1509 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4000 |
|
|
07/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1800 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61800 |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
13/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61800 |
|
|