|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1922 | 17/06/1922 | 41 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1923 | 13/10/1923 | 61 days | General | As 1633N |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1924 | 12/07/1924 | 41 days | Heavy | New chimney to G E gauge Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4633 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1925 | 22/04/1926 | 135 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1928 | 06/10/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1930 | 17/01/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1932 | 21/01/1933 | 57 days | General | Rebuilt to K2 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1935 | 08/06/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1937 | 24/04/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1938 | 14/01/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1940 | 30/11/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1941 | 21/06/1941 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1942 | 19/09/1942 | 57 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/10/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 42 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/06/1945 | 21/07/1945 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/11/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/11/1946 | 11/04/1947 | 135 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/01/1949 | 26/03/1949 | 76 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61723 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/03/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 88 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/06/1952 | 17/07/1952 | 42 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/09/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 62 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/10/1955 | 03/12/1955 | 61 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/06/1956 | 25/06/1956 | 18 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1633 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1374 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) |
||
08/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1922. Dep: 17/06/1922. | ||
14/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1923. Dep: 13/10/1923. Work undertaken: As 1633N |
||
05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
02/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/06/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924. Work undertaken: New chimney to G E gauge Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4633 |
||
01/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1925. Dep: 22/04/1926. | ||
18/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1928. Dep: 06/10/1928. | ||
13/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1930. Dep: 17/01/1931. | ||
14/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
26/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 21/01/1933. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to K2 |
||
18/01/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/03/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
11/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935. | ||
11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937. | ||
04/11/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
16/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
10/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1938. Dep: 14/01/1939. | ||
02/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. | ||
24/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1941. Dep: 21/06/1941. | ||
25/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1942. Dep: 19/09/1942. | ||
04/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
25/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. | ||
26/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945. | ||
30/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
01/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. | ||
30/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
30/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
22/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1723 | ||
28/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1946. Dep: 11/04/1947. | ||
10/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61723 |
||
28/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. | ||
06/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/06/1952. Dep: 17/07/1952. | ||
28/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. | ||
04/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/10/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955. | ||
08/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1956. Dep: 25/06/1956. | ||
04/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61723 from Colwick (40E) | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |