|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Works Sidings) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
26/04/1964 | Derby Shed (On Shed) | On Shed: 45334 x Wok - Cw, D1730, D1732, 12088, 12095, D3022, D4132, D5265 ex works; On Shed: D1735 undercoat, 42161, 42181, 44042, 44134, 44243, 44909, 45002, 45186, 45253, 47320, 47447, 47461, 48199, 48208, 48391, 48490, 48541, 73139, 78057, 90136, 90078, 90357, 90529, 92022, 60876, 68079. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 8079 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock, Works Number 2213 |
||
09/1946 | To Service | To service as WD Number 71464 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock, Works Number 2213 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) | ||
10/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
10/1950 | Modification | Modification: Extended bunker fitted | ||
10/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68079 | ||
14/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) | ||
02/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (16C) | ||
20/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L) | ||
29/10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68079 |