Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1325 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14731 Week
» 67747 Month
» 187274 Year
» 3214127 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
69014 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2095 |
To Service |
During 12/1949 to Doncaster (DON) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 19/02/1962 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
on |
29/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
w/e |
03/02/1952 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/03/1961 |
Polmont MPD (in store) |
On 11th Mch. the following were in store-62682/9/90/1/3, 64482/515/8/32/5, 68448/54/71/2, 69014. |
SLS/196104 |
13/01/1962 |
Bo\'ness stored locos |
Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. |
SLS/196202 |
03/06/1962 |
Stored at Boness |
Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. |
SLS/196207 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 69014 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2095 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
03/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
19/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69014 |
|
|