Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 553 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18356 Week
» 71372 Month
» 190899 Year
» 3217752 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
69013 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2094 |
To Service |
During 12/1949 to Doncaster (DON) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/01/1962 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1950 |
Unreported renumberings |
The following locos have been reported as renumberd by observations, but whose changes have not been notified by the Eastern and North Eastern regions: 69353, 69674, 69719, 63719, 63951/4/5/6, an 69012/3; the latter pair of 'J.72's' were delivered in the 60000 series! |
SLS/195007 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 69013 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2094 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
28/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
03/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
21/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
11/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
22/01/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69013 |
|
|