Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2003 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15409 Week
» 68425 Month
» 187952 Year
» 3214805 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
69004 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2085 |
To Service |
During 11/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/09/1963 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
on |
17/11/1949 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
5w/e |
10/03/1962 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
3w/e |
31/03/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 69004 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2085 |
|
|
19/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
23/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69004 |
|
|