Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1887 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15293 Week
» 68309 Month
» 187836 Year
» 3214689 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
574 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8752 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68752 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Works Number |
1634 |
To Service |
During 12/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 01/02/1960 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1925 |
HLA |
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
53A |
|
Hull Dairycoates |
5w/e |
24/08/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
01/02/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 574 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1634 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8752 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68752 |
|
|
24/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
01/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68752 |
|
|