Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 549 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18352 Week
» 71368 Month
» 190895 Year
» 3217748 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2180 |
m/e |
09/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8697 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
68697 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 09/1914 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 01/02/1960 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
5w/e |
27/02/1954 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
on |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1914 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2180 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8697 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68697 |
|
|
20/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
01/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68697 |
|
|