Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1101 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18904 Week
» 71920 Month
» 191447 Year
» 3218300 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
572 |
m/e |
02/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8278 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
68278 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 02/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/02/1961 |
Service Life |
69 yrs , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
w/e |
17/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
52C.3 |
Hexham |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
22/05/1954 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 572 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8278 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68278 |
|
|
17/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alston (52c) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hexham (52c) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) |
|
|
06/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68278 |
|
|