Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2467 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 7620 Week
» 142436 Month
» 345100 Year
» 3371953 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
397 |
m/e |
11/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7397 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8509 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68509 |
m/e |
06/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A26 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/03/1954 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 4 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
SL |
South Lynn |
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/03/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 397 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7397 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8509 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
06/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68509 |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
22/03/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68509 |
|
|