Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3490 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16896 Week
» 69912 Month
» 189439 Year
» 3216292 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
926 |
m/e |
03/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3926 |
m/e |
04/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8760 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68760 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
605 |
To Service |
During 03/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 09/11/1954 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1893 |
HSY |
|
Hornsey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
35A |
|
New England |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
35A |
|
New England |
4w/e |
20/09/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/11/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/11/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 926 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 605 |
|
|
04/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3926 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8760 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68760 |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
09/11/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68760 |
|
|